Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Owens, Cynthia D, filed a(n) Circuit Civil 3-C case represented by Evers, Kenneth Bruce, against Bailey, William B 1, City Of Arcadia, Dmi America Inc, Michael Ray Bush Llc, Sabal Palm Bank, (total of 5) See All represented by Dramis, George Joseph, Rudge, Timothy John, Williams, Steele Thomas, Wohl, Thomas James, in the jurisdiction of Desoto County, FL, . Desoto County, FL Superior Courts with BREWER, DANIELLE LYNN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBREWER, DANIELLE LYNN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 28, 2022 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-C |
Last RefreshedDecember 23, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationDesoto County, FL |
|
This complaint is filed by Cynthia D. Owens, as Trustee of the Joseph W. Mason Revocable Trust, against defendants William B. Bailey, Sr., DMI AMERICA, INC., Michael Ray Bush, LLC, Sabal Palm Bank, and City of Arcadia. The purpose of the complaint is...
CIVIL COVER SHEET FILED
Date: March 28, 2022COMPLAINT
Date: March 28, 2022SUMMONS ISSUED (WILLIAM BAILEY SR)
Date: March 28, 2022SUMMONS ISSUED (CT CORP SYSTEM)
Date: March 28, 2022SUMMONS ISSUED (MICHAEL RAY BUSH LLC)
Date: March 28, 2022SUMMONS ISSUED (SABAL PALM BANK)
Date: March 28, 2022SUMMONS ISSUED (CITY OF ARCADIA)
Date: March 28, 2022NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS
Date: March 28, 2022NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS
Date: March 29, 2022ANSWER TO COMPLAINT
Date: April 18, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: April 28, 2022SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED-TERRY STEWART AS THE CITY OF ARCADIA ADMIN 4/12/22
Date: April 19, 2022SUMMONS RETURNED UNEXECUTED-WILLIAM B BAILEY, SR. 4/12/22
Date: April 19, 2022MOTION TO DISMISS OF DEFENDANT, SABAL PALM BANK
Date: April 26, 2022MOTION TO DISMISS
Date: May 04, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & DESIGNTATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES
Date: April 28, 2022DEFENDANT DMI AMERICA, INC'S MOTION TO DISMISS
Date: May 23, 2022DEFENDANT DMI AMERICA, INC'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO PLAINTIFF
Date: June 01, 2022DEFENDANT DMI AMERICA, INC'S NOTICE OF PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFF
Date: May 25, 2022DEFENDANT DMI AMERICA, INC'S NOTICE OF PRODUCTION TO NON-PARTY
Date: June 01, 2022MOTION TO COMPEL
Date: July 06, 2022MOTION TO COMPEL DEPO OF PLTF
Date: July 07, 2022PLAINTIFF RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT, DMI AMERICA, INC'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: July 08, 2022NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION (CYNTHIA OWENS):7/26/22 @10:30AM
Date: July 19, 2022MOTION TO DEEM ADMISSIONS ADMITTED
Date: July 07, 2022NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION -CYNTHIA D. OWENS 7/26/22 AT 10:30 AM
Date: July 13, 2022NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE F/R INST #202214007380
Date: September 08, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 08, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE F/R INST #202214007380 | |
September 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
July 19, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION (CYNTHIA OWENS):7/26/22 @10:30AM | |
July 13, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION -CYNTHIA D. OWENS 7/26/22 AT 10:30 AM | |
July 08, 2022 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT, DMI AMERICA, INC'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS | |
July 07, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION TO COMPEL DEPO OF PLTF | |
July 07, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION TO DEEM ADMISSIONS ADMITTED | |
July 06, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION TO COMPEL | |
June 01, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT DMI AMERICA, INC'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO PLAINTIFF | |
June 01, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT DMI AMERICA, INC'S NOTICE OF PRODUCTION TO NON-PARTY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.