Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Midfirst Bank, The Money Source Inc, filed a(n) Circuit Civil 3-C case represented by Carey, Molly Emma, Lanning, Peter Earl, against Barbara Matthews, The Unknown Spouse Of Barbara, The Unknown Tenant In Possessi, in the jurisdiction of Desoto County, FL, . Desoto County, FL Superior Courts with FLOWERS, GUY ALAN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFLOWERS, GUY ALAN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 22, 2022 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-C |
Last RefreshedDecember 27, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationDesoto County, FL |
|
This complaint is a verified complaint to foreclose a mortgage filed by The Money Source Inc. against Barbara Matthews, also known as Barbara Jean Matthews, and other unknown parties. The Plaintiff is seeking to foreclose a mortgage on real property ...
CIVIL COVER SHEET FILED
Date: March 22, 2022VERIFIED COMPLAINT TO FORECLOSE MORTGAGE
Date: March 22, 2022OATH OF ATTORNEY AD LITEM, ADMINISTRATOR AD LITEM & GUARDIAN AD LITEM
Date: July 13, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 13, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING MILITARY STATUS AFFIDAVIT | |
December 13, 2023 | Docket Event | MILITARY STATUS AFFIDAVIT | |
November 30, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ACTION ISSUED & MAILED TO ATTY FOR PUB | |
November 28, 2023 | Docket Event | SWORN STATEMENT FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS BY PUBLICATION (UNK HEIRS) | |
November 28, 2023 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH & INQUIRY | |
November 28, 2023 | Docket Event | SWORN STATEMENT FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS BY PUBLICATION (PHILLIP PICARD) | |
November 28, 2023 | Docket Event | SWORN STATEMENT FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS BY PUBLICATION (NICOLE LEA COTTERMAN) | |
November 11, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE (NICOLE COTTERMAN) SUMMONS RETURNED NON SERVED 9/5/23 | |
November 10, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE SUMMONS RCVD BY JESSICA PICARD 9/26/23 | |
November 10, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE (PHILLIP PICARD) SUMMONS RETURNED NOT FOUND 10/12/23 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.