Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Pennymac Loan Services Llc, filed a(n) Circuit Civil 3-C case represented by Cournoyer, Derek Raymond, against Poling, Danny, Poling, Whitney, Unknown Tenant 1 In Possession, Unknown Tenant 2 In Possession, in the jurisdiction of Desoto County, FL, . Desoto County, FL Superior Courts with BREWER, DANIELLE LYNN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBREWER, DANIELLE LYNN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 15, 2022 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-C |
Last RefreshedJanuary 17, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationDesoto County, FL |
|
This complaint is a foreclosure action filed by PennyMac Loan Services, LLC against Danny Poling and Whitney Poling, as well as two unknown tenants in possession of the property. The complaint alleges that on May 6, 2016, Danny Poling executed a prom...
CIVIL COVER SHEET FILED
Date: January 15, 2022VERIFIED COMPLAINT
Date: January 15, 2022SUMMONS ISSUED (UNK TEN #1)
Date: January 15, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 20, 2022 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
April 20, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL & DISCHARGE OF LIS PENDENS F/R INST #202114003249 | |
April 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
April 06, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE FOR NON JURY TRIAL | |
March 29, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTIES | |
March 29, 2022 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF MOTION FOR DEFAULT/DEFAULT ISSUED (WHITNEY POLING) | |
March 29, 2022 | Docket Event | VERIFIED STATEMENT OF MILITARY STATUS | |
February 14, 2022 | Docket Event | RESPONSE FROM DANNY POLING | |
February 08, 2022 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE SUMMONS RCVD BY DANNY POLING 2/1/22 | |
February 08, 2022 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE (UNK TEN) RETURNED NOT FOUND 2/1/22 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.