Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Olin, Melissa Gates filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Thomas, Jason, in the jurisdiction of Columbia County, FL, . Columbia County, FL Superior Courts with OLIN, MELISSA GATES presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeOLIN, MELISSA GATES Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 12, 2021 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationColumbia County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 05, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL | |
May 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
March 04, 2022 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE- JASON THOMAS NOT FOUND | |
March 01, 2022 | Docket Event | RETURNED MAIL | |
February 07, 2022 | Docket Event | PLURIES SUMMONS ISSUED | |
December 02, 2021 | Docket Event | RETURN OF NON SERVICE JASON THOMAS NOT FOUND | |
October 20, 2021 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED TO JASON THOMAS | |
October 18, 2021 | Docket Event | RETURN OF NON SERVICE | |
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event | RETURNED MAIL | |
September 28, 2021 | Docket Event | REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF HEARING OFFICER AND ORDER DENYING NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF SERVICE OF PROCESS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.