Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Wilmington Savings Fund Societ, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Cournoyer, Derek Raymond, against Columbia County Clerk Of Court, Ray, Deetris Nicole, State Of Florida, Unknown Tenant No 1, Unknown Tenant No 2, (total of 7) See All in the jurisdiction of Columbia County, FL, . Columbia County, FL Superior Courts with DOUGLAS, WESLEY RAYMOND presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDOUGLAS, WESLEY RAYMOND Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 22, 2017 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 37-D |
Last RefreshedApril 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationColumbia County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 08, 2019 | Docket Event | WRIT OF POSSESSION SERVED | |
June 14, 2019 | Docket Event | WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED | |
June 13, 2019 | Docket Event | Case Status set to RECLOSED | |
June 13, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION | |
May 20, 2019 | Docket Event | Case Status set to REOPENED | |
May 20, 2019 | Docket Event | Reopened for CIVIL OTHER on 5/20/2019 | |
May 20, 2019 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION | |
May 20, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS CO-COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF | |
May 20, 2019 | Docket Event | NON MILITARY AFFIDAVIT | |
May 20, 2019 | Docket Event | Payment received: $50.00 Receipt Number CC 151077 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.