Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Isv Management Inc, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case against Paxton, Robert, in the jurisdiction of Collier County, FL, . Collier County, FL Superior Courts with Foster, Joseph G presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFoster, Joseph G Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2019 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedJuly 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationCollier County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 12, 2020 | Docket Event | Default issued by clerk on Robert Paxton | |
February 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Motion for Clerk's Default | |
February 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Military Service for Paxton, Robert | |
February 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Default Not Entered | |
February 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Generate Notice of Default Not Entered | |
February 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Motion for Clerk's Default | |
January 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Return of Service of Summons on Paxton, Robert, served 01/11/2020 | |
January 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Paid $10.00 on receipt 1081309, Fully Paid | |
January 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Summons issued | |
December 31, 2019 | Docket Event | Standing Order - Circuit |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.