Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
The Lykos Group Inc, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case against Feins, Amy, Feins, Jonathan, in the jurisdiction of Collier County, FL, . Collier County, FL Superior Courts with Foster, Joseph G presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFoster, Joseph G Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 05, 2019 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationCollier County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 31, 2019 | Docket Event | Paid $400.00 on receipt 1081023, Fully Paid | |
December 31, 2019 | Docket Event | Standing Order - Circuit | |
December 31, 2019 | Docket Event | Fees Paid or Waived for in Collier Transfer | |
December 30, 2019 | Docket Event | Cover Letter | |
November 14, 2019 | Docket Event | Order Transferring Case to Circuit Court | |
November 14, 2019 | Docket Event | Correspondence to Judge, from Counsel | |
November 12, 2019 | Docket Event | Motion to Transfer - by The Lykos Group, Inc. | |
November 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Interrogatories | |
October 10, 2019 | Docket Event | Motion to Strike - | |
July 09, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance and Designation of Email Address by Castro II, Jason Kenneth for The Lykos Group, Inc. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.