Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Webb Roofing And Construction Llc, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case against First Protective Insurance Company, in the jurisdiction of Collier County, FL, . Collier County, FL Superior Courts with Foster, Joseph G presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFoster, Joseph G Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2019 |
CategoryInsurance Claim |
Last RefreshedJuly 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationCollier County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Motion for Extension of Time - | |
February 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Motion for Extension of Time - | |
January 27, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance by Gutterman, Marc Jason for First Protective Insurance Company | |
January 27, 2020 | Docket Event | Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint/Petition - by First Protective Insurance Company | |
January 27, 2020 | Docket Event | Designation of E-Mail Address | |
December 30, 2019 | Docket Event | Paid $410.00 on receipt 1080664, Fully Paid | |
December 30, 2019 | Docket Event | Request for Admissions | |
December 30, 2019 | Docket Event | Request for Production | |
December 29, 2019 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet with Demand for Jury Trial | |
December 29, 2019 | Docket Event | Complaint & Demand for Jury Trial |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.