Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Marquez, Daniel, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case against United Property & Casualty Insurance Company, in the jurisdiction of Collier County, FL, . Collier County, FL Superior Courts with Foster, Joseph G presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFoster, Joseph G Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 27, 2019 |
CategoryInsurance Claim |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationCollier County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint/Petition - by United Property & Casualty Insurance Company | |
February 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Complaint, Amended | |
February 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Request for Admissions | |
February 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Change of Attorney and Designation of Email Address for Daniel Marquez to Stephan, Lance Bryan | |
January 29, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance and Designation of Email Address by Cooper, Christopher Robert, Manseur, Mehdi for United Property & Casualty Insurance Company | |
January 29, 2020 | Docket Event | Motion for Extension of Time - | |
January 29, 2020 | Docket Event | Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint/Petition - by United Property & Casualty Insurance Company | |
December 30, 2019 | Docket Event | Paid $410.00 on receipt 1080634, Fully Paid | |
December 27, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Interrogatories | |
December 27, 2019 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet with Demand for Jury Trial |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.