Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Roofing & Reconstruction Contractors Of America Llc, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case against Auto Owners Insurance Company, Southern Owners Insurance Company, in the jurisdiction of Collier County, FL, . Collier County, FL Superior Courts with Unassigned Judge presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeUnassigned Judge Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 27, 2019 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedJuly 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationCollier County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 19, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition | |
February 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Request for Admissions | |
February 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Interrogatories | |
February 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Request for Production | |
February 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Complaint, Amended | |
January 27, 2020 | Docket Event | Motion to Dismiss by Auto Owners Insurance Company | |
January 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Process by Chief Financial Officer for Auto Owners Insurance Company, on 01/07/2020 | |
January 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance and Designation of Email Address by Quijano, Natisha Nirupa for Roofing & Reconstruction Contractors Of America Llc | |
December 30, 2019 | Docket Event | Paid $410.00 on receipt 1080614, Fully Paid | |
December 27, 2019 | Docket Event | Complaint & Demand for Jury Trial |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.