Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Michalik, Josephine, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case against Hartford Insurance Company Of The Midwest, in the jurisdiction of Collier County, FL, . Collier County, FL Superior Courts with Unassigned Judge presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeUnassigned Judge Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 26, 2019 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedJuly 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationCollier County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Motion for Extension of Time - | |
January 22, 2020 | Docket Event | Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint/Petition - by Hartford Insurance Company Of The Midwest | |
January 15, 2020 | Docket Event | Designation of E-Mail Address | |
January 07, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance and Designation of Email Address by Jurgus, Tracy Ann, Beshir, Samera for Hartford Insurance Company Of The Midwest | |
January 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Process by Chief Financial Officer for Hartford Insurance Company Of The Midwest, on 01/02/2020 | |
December 27, 2019 | Docket Event | Paid $410.00 on receipt 1080312, Fully Paid | |
December 26, 2019 | Docket Event | Complaint & Demand for Jury Trial | |
December 26, 2019 | Docket Event | Request for Admissions | |
December 26, 2019 | Docket Event | Request for Production | |
December 26, 2019 | Docket Event | Standing Order - Circuit |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.