Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Bayview Loan Servicing Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Arielle At Pelican Marsh Condominium Association Inc, Camillo, Debra Pica, Citibank Federal Savings Bank, Feeney, Barbara Ann, Internal Revenue Service, (total of 10) See All in the jurisdiction of Collier County, FL, . Collier County, FL Superior Courts with Brodie, Lauren L presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBrodie, Lauren L Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 24, 2019 |
CategoryNon-Homestead Foreclosure $50,001 - $249,999 |
Last RefreshedMay 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationCollier County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 26, 2020 | Docket Event | Request for Production | |
February 26, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Interrogatories | |
February 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Answer and Affirmative Defense by Arturo J Maldonado | |
February 20, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Dropping Party Unknown Tenant 1, Unknown Tenant 2 | |
February 20, 2020 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Military Service for Maldonado, Arturo J,Feeney, Barbara Ann,Pica, Phillip,Camillo, Debra Pica | |
February 20, 2020 | Docket Event | Motion for Clerk's Default | |
February 12, 2020 | Docket Event | Designation of E-Mail Address | |
February 12, 2020 | Docket Event | Answer and Affirmative Defense by Arielle At Pelican Marsh Condominium Association Inc | |
February 05, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance and Designation of Email Address by Shapiro, Marc L for Arturo J Maldonado | |
January 29, 2020 | Docket Event | Reply to Answer and Affirmative Defenses |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.