Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Nichols, Sarah, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case against First Protective Insurance Company, in the jurisdiction of Collier County, FL, . Collier County, FL Superior Courts with Brodie, Lauren L presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBrodie, Lauren L Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 20, 2019 |
CategoryInsurance Claim |
Last RefreshedJuly 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationCollier County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 19, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Process by Chief Financial Officer for First Protective Insurance Company, on 12/30/2019 | |
February 19, 2020 | Docket Event | Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint/Petition - by First Protective Insurance Company | |
January 20, 2020 | Docket Event | Motion for Extension of Time - | |
January 20, 2020 | Docket Event | Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint/Petition - by First Protective Insurance Company | |
January 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance and Designation of Email Address by Ortiz, Michelle G for First Protective Insurance Company | |
December 23, 2019 | Docket Event | Paid $410.00 on receipt 1079369, Fully Paid | |
December 20, 2019 | Docket Event | Summons issued | |
December 20, 2019 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet with Demand for Jury Trial | |
December 20, 2019 | Docket Event | Complaint & Demand for Jury Trial | |
December 20, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Interrogatories |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.