Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Desire, Gerard, Desire, Myrlande, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case against Progressive Property Insurance Company, in the jurisdiction of Collier County, FL, . Collier County, FL Superior Courts with Hayes, Hugh D presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHayes, Hugh D Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2017 |
CategoryInsurance Claim |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationCollier County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal Recorded 2018-03-26 Instrument# 5529808 | |
March 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Cover Letter | |
March 21, 2018 | Docket Event | Stipulation for Dismissal Progressive Property Insurance Company, | |
February 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Settlement Agreement | |
January 30, 2018 | Docket Event | Designation of E-Mail Address | |
January 30, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance by Hall, Jason Derek for Progressive Property Insurance Company | |
December 29, 2017 | Docket Event | Paid $410.00 on receipt 901713, Fully Paid | |
December 28, 2017 | Docket Event | Standing Order - Circuit | |
December 28, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Interrogatories | |
December 28, 2017 | Docket Event | Insurance Claim |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.