Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Miller, Ellen Wherrett, Miller, Margaret Mctague, Miller, Mary Dolan, Miller, Sara Kane, Poekel, Vahey Miller, (total of 5) See All filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case against C G Of Naples Inc, in the jurisdiction of Collier County, FL, . Collier County, FL Superior Courts with Krier, Elizabeth V presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKrier, Elizabeth V Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2017 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedOctober 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationCollier County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Final Disposition Form | |
January 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal C G Of Naples Inc, Poekel, Vahey Miller, Miller, Mary Dolan, Miller, Margaret Mctague, Miller, Sara Kane, Miller, Ellen Wherrett Recorded 2020-01-30 Instrument# 5822036 | |
January 29, 2020 | Docket Event | Stipulation for Dismissal C G Of Naples Inc, Poekel, Vahey Miller, Miller, Mary Dolan, Miller, Margaret Mctague, Miller, Sara Kane, Miller, Ellen Wherrett | |
June 09, 2019 | Docket Event | Disburse - Registry | |
June 04, 2019 | Docket Event | Order Directing Disbursement Of Funds And Abatement Of Action | |
June 03, 2019 | Docket Event | Motion to Vacate Order - Stipulation | |
June 03, 2019 | Docket Event | Motion for Release of Funds from Court Registry | |
May 30, 2019 | Docket Event | Cancelled Non-Jury Trial on 7/3/2019 10:00:00 AM due to CASE DISPOSED | |
May 30, 2019 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal C G Of Naples Inc, Poekel, Vahey Miller, Miller, Mary Dolan, Miller, Margaret Mctague, Miller, Sara Kane, Miller, Ellen Wherrett Recorded 2019-05-31 Instrument# 5719364 | |
May 29, 2019 | Docket Event | Presiding Judge: Krier, Elizabeth V |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.