Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Maydish, Barbara, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case against Homeowners Choice Property & Casualty Insurance Company Inc, in the jurisdiction of Collier County, FL, . Collier County, FL Superior Courts with Foster, Joseph G presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFoster, Joseph G Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2017 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationCollier County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
This complaint is filed by Barbara Maydish against Homeowners Choice Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Inc. The complaint alleges breach of contract by the defendant. The plaintiff states that she had a policy of insurance with the defendant for...
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 26, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Homeowners Choice Property & Casualty Insurance Company Inc | |
March 20, 2019 | Docket Event | Cancelled Jury Trial on 4/24/2019 9:00:00 AM due to per JACS - settled | |
March 18, 2019 | Docket Event | Settlement Agreement | |
March 18, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement | |
March 18, 2019 | Docket Event | Cancelled Pre-Trial on 3/18/2019 11:00:00 AM due to per JACS - settled | |
March 13, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation of Mediation Hearing | |
March 13, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Mediation | |
March 06, 2019 | Docket Event | Motion for Continuance - | |
February 26, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition | |
February 08, 2019 | Docket Event | Order Granting Extension of Time |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.