Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Us Bank Na, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Licare, Richard L, Licare, Vajeana, Midland Funding Llc, Naples Hma Llc, Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc, (total of 9) See All in the jurisdiction of Collier County, FL, . Collier County, FL Superior Courts with Pivacek, Cynthia presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePivacek, Cynthia Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2017 |
CategoryHomestead Residential Foreclosure $250,000 Or More |
Last RefreshedOctober 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationCollier County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
This complaint is a foreclosure action filed by U.S. Bank N.A., as trustee for the J.P. Morgan Mortgage Acquisition Trust 2006-WMC4 Asset Backed Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2006-WMC4, against Richard L. Licare, Vajeana Licare, Portfolio Recover...
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 30, 2019 | Docket Event | Correspondence to Counsel from Clerk | |
July 02, 2019 | Docket Event | Cancelled Foreclosure Sale on 7/11/2019 11:00:00 AM due to | |
July 01, 2019 | Docket Event | Order to Set Aside Final Judgment, Dismiss Case, Cancel Foreclosure Sale, Cancel Lis Pendens and Return Original Loan Documents Recorded 2019-07-02 Instrument# 5734208 | |
July 01, 2019 | Docket Event | Cover Letter | |
June 25, 2019 | Docket Event | Final Disposition Form | |
June 25, 2019 | Docket Event | Motion to Set Aside Final Judgment, Dismiss Case, Cancel Foreclosure Sale, Cancel Lis Pendens and Return Original Loan Documents - Stipulation | |
February 22, 2019 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Publication of Notice of Sale | |
February 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Confirmation of e-mail Received by Business Observer, regarding Publication | |
February 08, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Foreclosure Sale | |
February 08, 2019 | Docket Event | Cancelled Hearing on 2/7/2019 1:30:00 PM due to CASE DISPOSED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.