Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Shebert, Jason, Shebert, Yolanda, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case against Tower Hill Prime Insurance Company, in the jurisdiction of Collier County, FL, . Collier County, FL Superior Courts with Brodie, Lauren L presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBrodie, Lauren L Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2017 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationCollier County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
This complaint is filed by Jason and Yolanda Shebert against Tower Hill Prime Insurance Company. The Sheberts are the owners of a property located at 2427 Ravenna Blvd, Unit 201, Naples, FL. They had a property insurance policy with Tower Hill, and o...
Notice for Jury Trial
Date:Agreed Case Management Plan and Order
Date: July 18, 2018Notice for Jury Trial
Date: July 05, 2018Order of Dismissal Recorded 2018-09-25 Instrument# 5616107
Date: September 21, 2018Notice of Service of Answered Interrogatories
Date: June 25, 2018Stipulation for Dismissal Tower Hill Prime Insurance Company
Date: September 21, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: June 25, 2018Order Scheduling Case Management Conference with Case Manager
Date: June 25, 2018Cover Letter
Date: September 21, 2018Order Setting Trial, Pretrial Conference and Docket Sounding
Date: August 08, 2018Notice of Service of Offer/Proposal of Settlement
Date: June 04, 2018Reply to Affirmative Defenses
Date: July 05, 2018Standing Order - Circuit
Date: December 28, 2017Answer and Affirmative Defense by Tower Hill Prime Insurance Company
Date: June 22, 2018Summons issued
Date: December 28, 2017Order Setting Hearing Motion For Extention Of Time @ 10:00
Date: May 25, 2018Order Scheduling Case Management Conference with Case Manager
Date: April 19, 2018Motion for Extension of Time -
Date: February 22, 2018Civil Cover Sheet with Demand for Jury Trial
Date: December 28, 2017Designation of E-Mail Address
Date: January 18, 2018Paid $410.00 on receipt 901408, Fully Paid
Date: December 28, 2017Notice of Service of Interrogatories
Date: December 28, 2017Request for Production
Date: December 28, 2017Complaint & Demand for Jury Trial
Date: December 28, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 24, 2018 | Docket Event | Cancelled Pre-Trial on 1/10/2019 10:30:00 AM due to CASE DISPOSED | |
September 24, 2018 | Docket Event | Cancelled Sounding on 2/21/2019 9:30:00 AM due to CASE DISPOSED | |
September 24, 2018 | Docket Event | Cancelled Jury Trial on 2/25/2019 9:30:00 AM due to CASE DISPOSED | |
September 21, 2018 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal Recorded 2018-09-25 Instrument# 5616107 | |
September 21, 2018 | Docket Event | Stipulation for Dismissal Tower Hill Prime Insurance Company | |
September 21, 2018 | Docket Event | Cover Letter | |
August 09, 2018 | Docket Event | Set on Jury Trial docket 2/25/2019 beginning at 9:30 AM Brodie, Lauren L (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time) | |
August 09, 2018 | Docket Event | Set on Pre-Trial docket 1/10/2019 beginning at 10:30 AM Brodie, Lauren L (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time) | |
August 09, 2018 | Docket Event | Set on Sounding docket 2/21/2019 beginning at 9:30 AM Brodie, Lauren L (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time) | |
August 08, 2018 | Docket Event | Order Setting Trial, Pretrial Conference and Docket Sounding |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.