Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Weichelt, George, Weichelt, Megan, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case against Cypress Property & Casualty Insurance Company, in the jurisdiction of Collier County, FL, . Collier County, FL Superior Courts with Unassigned Judge presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeUnassigned Judge Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2017 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedNovember 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationCollier County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
This complaint is filed by George and Megan Weichelt against Cypress Property & Casualty Insurance Company. The Weichelts are the owners of a property located at 6170 Bur Oaks Lane, Naples, FL. The complaint alleges that the property was damaged by w...
Order for Mediation
Date:Notice of Mediation
Date:Notice for Jury Trial
Date:Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Cypress Property & Casualty Insurance Company
Date: October 23, 2018Certificate of Settlement/Mediation Authority
Date: June 28, 2018Notice of Mediation
Date: June 28, 2018Notice of Cancellation of Hearing
Date: July 02, 2018Notice of Cancellation of Taking Deposition
Date: July 02, 2018Order of Referral to Magistrate
Date: May 21, 2018Notice of Hearing for Motion For Protective Order At 2:00
Date: June 14, 2018Return of Service of Subpoena
Date: May 31, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: May 02, 2018Agreed Case Management Plan and Order
Date: May 25, 2018Motion for Protective Order -
Date: April 27, 2018Order Setting Pretrial and Trial Cycle Commencing 121818
Date: May 25, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: June 27, 2018Order for Mediation
Date: May 29, 2018Objection to Assigned Mediator & Notice Of Previously Scheduled Mediation
Date: June 04, 2018Notice of Cancellation of Taking Deposition
Date: June 14, 2018Cover Letter
Date: May 25, 2018Notice of Mediation
Date: April 26, 2018Order Scheduling Case Management Conference with Case Manager
Date: April 23, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: April 25, 2018Notice for Jury Trial
Date: April 09, 2018Reply to Affirmative Defenses
Date: April 09, 2018Privilege Log by Cypress Property & Casualty Insurance Company,
Date: March 21, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: March 21, 2018Notice of Service of Answered Interrogatories
Date: March 21, 2018Answer and Affirmative Defense by Cypress Property & Casualty Insurance Company
Date: February 08, 2018Paid $410.00 on receipt 901329, Fully Paid
Date: December 28, 2017Standing Order - Circuit
Date: December 28, 2017Summons issued
Date: December 28, 2017Request for Production
Date: December 28, 2017Notice of Service of Interrogatories
Date: December 28, 2017Complaint & Demand for Jury Trial
Date: December 28, 2017Civil Cover Sheet with Demand for Jury Trial
Date: December 28, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 23, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Cypress Property & Casualty Insurance Company | |
August 15, 2018 | Docket Event | Cancelled Pre-Trial on 10/17/2018 1:30:00 PM due to Per Judge's Office | |
July 02, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation of Hearing | |
July 02, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation of Taking Deposition | |
July 02, 2018 | Docket Event | Cancelled Hearing on 8/13/2018 2:00:00 PM due to per JACS - case settled | |
June 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Certificate of Settlement/Mediation Authority | |
June 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Mediation | |
June 27, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition | |
June 15, 2018 | Docket Event | Set on Hearing docket 8/13/2018 beginning at 2:00 PM Friedman, David C (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time) | |
June 14, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing for Motion For Protective Order At 2:00 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.