Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Cuba, Geover, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case against Florida Peninsula Insurance Company, in the jurisdiction of Collier County, FL, . Collier County, FL Superior Courts with Hayes, Hugh D presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHayes, Hugh D Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 26, 2017 |
CategoryInsurance Claim |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationCollier County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
This complaint is filed by Geover Cuba against Florida Peninsula Insurance Company for breach of contract. Geover Cuba is the homeowner and insured under the defendant's insurance policy. The property, located at 180 10th Ave NE, Naples, FL 34120, su...
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Florida Peninsula Insurance Company | |
February 27, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance and Designation of Email Address by Turner, Hazel Kathryn for Florida Peninsula Insurance Company | |
February 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Cover Letter | |
February 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Order Granting Extension of Time | |
January 29, 2018 | Docket Event | Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint/Petition - by Florida Peninsula Insurance Company | |
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance and Designation of Email Address by Goodnow, Jr James Charles for Florida Peninsula Insurance Company | |
January 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Paid $10.00 on receipt 903061, Fully Paid | |
January 04, 2018 | Docket Event | Summons issued | |
December 28, 2017 | Docket Event | Paid $400.00 on receipt 901129, Fully Paid | |
December 28, 2017 | Docket Event | Receipt Revised |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.