Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Johnson, Rosie A, Johnson Sr, Richard A, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case against Americana Kitchen & Bath Cabinets Llc, Diaz, Antonio, Diaz, Gerardo, in the jurisdiction of Collier County, FL, . Collier County, FL Superior Courts with Foster, Joseph G presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFoster, Joseph G Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 26, 2017 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedNovember 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationCollier County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
This complaint was filed by Richard A. Johnson, Sr. and Rosie A. Johnson against Americana Kitchen & Bath Cabinets, LLC, Gerardo Diaz, and Antonio Diaz. The plaintiffs are residents of Collier County, Florida, and the defendants are a Florida limited...
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 08, 2019 | Docket Event | Per Administrative Order, case reassigned to Judge Krier, Elizabeth V | |
September 06, 2018 | Docket Event | Cancelled Case Management on 9/6/2018 9:00:00 AM due to CASE DISPOSED | |
September 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Americana Kitchen & Bath Cabinets Llc, Diaz, Antonio | |
July 25, 2018 | Docket Event | Returned Mail | |
July 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Set on Case Management docket 9/6/2018 beginning at 9:00 AM Hardt, Frederick R (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time) | |
July 18, 2018 | Docket Event | Order Scheduling Case Management Conference | |
June 30, 2018 | Docket Event | Per Administrative Order, case reassigned to Judge Hardt, Frederick R | |
June 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Payment Received - Copies Sent | |
June 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for Copies | |
May 22, 2018 | Docket Event | Returned Mail |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.