Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Hoover, Cherie, Hoover, Gerald, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case against Federated National Insurance Company, in the jurisdiction of Collier County, FL, . Collier County, FL Superior Courts with Hayes, Hugh D presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHayes, Hugh D Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 22, 2017 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationCollier County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
This complaint is filed by Cherie and Gerald Hoover against Federated National Insurance Company. The plaintiffs are seeking damages in excess of $15,000, exclusive of attorneys' fees and costs. The plaintiffs' home in Marco Island, Florida was signi...
Notice of Arbitration
Date:Witness List
Date:Motion for Mediation -
Date:Notice for Jury Trial
Date:Standing Order - Circuit
Date:Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Federated National Insurance Company
Date: April 18, 2019Mediator/Mediation Report - Agreement Reached
Date: February 05, 2019Notice of Arbitration
Date: December 28, 2018Uniform Order Setting Jury Trial/Non-Jury Trial Pre-Trial Conference - 03/05/2019 @ 1:30 Pm
Date: December 14, 2018Witness List
Date: December 13, 2018Order/Referral to Nonbinding Arbitration
Date: October 17, 2018Order Setting Pretrial and Trial Cycle Commencing 060319
Date: October 15, 2018Answer and Affirmative Defense by Federated National Insurance Company
Date: August 21, 2018Agreed Case Management Plan and Order
Date: October 15, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: September 19, 2018Order Scheduling Case Management Conference with Case Manager
Date: September 18, 2018Motion for Mediation -
Date: September 12, 2018Notice for Jury Trial
Date: September 06, 2018Reply to Affirmative Defenses
Date: August 21, 2018Motion for Extension of Time -
Date: August 06, 2018Notice of Service of Answered Interrogatories
Date: September 19, 2018Order Granting Extension of Time
Date: July 19, 2018Motion for Extension of Time -
Date: June 27, 2018Designation of E-Mail Address
Date: June 15, 2018Paid $410.00 on receipt 900652, Fully Paid
Date: December 26, 2017Standing Order - Circuit
Date: December 22, 2017Request for Production
Date: December 22, 2017Complaint And Demand For Jury Trial
Date: December 22, 2017Notice of Service of Interrogatories
Date: December 22, 2017Summons issued
Date: December 22, 2017Civil Cover Sheet with Demand for Jury Trial
Date: December 22, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 18, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Federated National Insurance Company | |
February 25, 2019 | Docket Event | Cancelled Pre-Trial on 3/5/2019 1:30:00 PM due to per Judge's Office | |
February 05, 2019 | Docket Event | Mediator/Mediation Report - Agreement Reached | |
January 17, 2019 | Docket Event | Cancelled Pre-Trial on 4/3/2019 1:30:00 PM due to amended order | |
December 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Arbitration | |
December 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Set on Pre-Trial docket 3/5/2019 beginning at 1:30 PM Hayes, Hugh D (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time) | |
December 14, 2018 | Docket Event | Uniform Order Setting Jury Trial/Non-Jury Trial Pre-Trial Conference - 03/05/2019 @ 1:30 Pm | |
December 13, 2018 | Docket Event | Witness List | |
November 13, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance and Designation of Email Address by James, Robert C for Federated National Insurance Company | |
October 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Order/Referral to Nonbinding Arbitration |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.