Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Parkwood Holdings Group Llc, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case against North East Realty Llc, in the jurisdiction of Collier County, FL, . Collier County, FL Superior Courts with Foster, Joseph G presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFoster, Joseph G Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 20, 2017 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedSeptember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationCollier County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
This complaint is filed by Parkwood Holdings Group, LLC (PHG) against North East Realty, LLC. PHG is a Florida limited liability company, while North East Realty is a New Jersey limited liability company that conducts or conducted business in Collier...
Satisfaction of Judgment
Date:Writ of Garnishment
Date:Notice of Filing
Date:Standing Order - Circuit
Date:Complaint, Amended
Date:Notice of Service of Judgment
Date: April 25, 2018Satisfaction of Judgment
Date: June 25, 2018Answer to Writ of Garnishment from Td Bank Na
Date: April 25, 2018Answer to Writ of Garnishment from Wells Fargo Bank Na
Date: April 23, 2018Voluntary Dismissal of Garnishment
Date: May 07, 2018Return of Service of Writ of Garnishment on Td Bank Na,, served 04/10/2018
Date: April 19, 2018Return of Service of Writ of Garnishment on Wells Fargo Bank Na,, served 04/10/2018
Date: April 19, 2018Paid $170.00 on receipt 926540, Fully Paid
Date: April 09, 2018Writ of Garnishment
Date: April 06, 2018Motion for Writ of Garnishment
Date: April 16, 2018Motion for Writ of Garnishment Parkwood Holdings Group Llc
Date: April 06, 2018Writ of Garnishment Submitted by Attorney
Date: April 06, 2018Final Judgment on North East Realty Llc, Recorded 2018-03-26 Instrument# 5529299
Date: March 23, 2018Notice of Filing
Date: March 19, 2018Notice of Hearing for Motion For Summary Judgment @ 11:00
Date: February 15, 2018Motion for Summary Judgment - by Parkwood Holdings Group Llc,
Date: February 13, 2018Motion for Clerk's Default
Date: February 05, 2018Cover Letter
Date: March 23, 2018Affidavit of Reasonable Attorney Fees
Date: February 16, 2018Paid $410.00 on receipt 900251, Fully Paid
Date: December 21, 2017Default issued by clerk on North East Realty Llc
Date: February 07, 2018Return of Service of Summons on North East Realty Llc,, served 01/11/2018
Date: January 22, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: December 20, 2017Complaint, Amended
Date: December 22, 2017Standing Order - Circuit
Date: December 20, 2017Summons issued
Date: December 20, 2017Complaint
Date: December 20, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 30, 2018 | Docket Event | Per Administrative Order, case reassigned to Judge Hardt, Frederick R | |
June 25, 2018 | Docket Event | Satisfaction of Judgment | |
May 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Voluntary Dismissal of Garnishment | |
April 25, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Judgment | |
April 25, 2018 | Docket Event | Answer to Writ of Garnishment from Td Bank Na | |
April 23, 2018 | Docket Event | Answer to Writ of Garnishment from Wells Fargo Bank Na | |
April 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Return of Service of Writ of Garnishment on Td Bank Na,, served 04/10/2018 | |
April 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Return of Service of Writ of Garnishment on Wells Fargo Bank Na,, served 04/10/2018 | |
April 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Motion for Writ of Garnishment | |
April 09, 2018 | Docket Event | Paid $170.00 on receipt 926540, Fully Paid |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.