Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Bank Of America Na, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case against Ranallo, John E, in the jurisdiction of Collier County, FL, . Collier County, FL Superior Courts with Brodie, Lauren L presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBrodie, Lauren L Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 20, 2017 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedSeptember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationCollier County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
This complaint is filed by Bank of America, N.A. against the defendant, John E Ranallo. The plaintiff alleges that the defendant is in default under a credit account between the two parties. The plaintiff claims that the defendant failed to make peri...
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 03, 2018 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal Ranallo, John E Recorded 2018-07-05 Instrument# 5581318 | |
May 21, 2018 | Docket Event | Motion for Extension of Time - | |
May 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE:image/png;123406;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/d6019405-7007-4e50-876c-98e02bdfac17/runs/e9f7e6ff-63f8-403f-ae98-9b8649c17400/executions/cc733f31-7eab-4c34-957b-0f9943fe2538/results/e7dbc76e-0b37-4d83-ace8-15e4c302cfa6/lines/c08d14cc-37a0-4744-8dae-ffdbecbe566a/Doc Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time for Service |
|
April 13, 2018 | Docket Event | Return of Non-Service | |
December 21, 2017 | Docket Event | Paid $410.00 on receipt 900095, Fully Paid | |
December 20, 2017 | Docket Event | Summons issued | |
December 20, 2017 | Docket Event | Standing Order - Circuit | |
December 20, 2017 | Docket Event | Contract and Indebtedness | |
December 20, 2017 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
December 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
FILE:image/png;136387;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/d6019405-7007-4e50-876c-98e02bdfac17/runs/e9f7e6ff-63f8-403f-ae98-9b8649c17400/executions/cc733f31-7eab-4c34-957b-0f9943fe2538/results/e7dbc76e-0b37-4d83-ace8-15e4c302cfa6/lines/dd064e2c-968f-4f0a-b1e4-1e5037fb7c78/Doc Civil Cover Sheet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.