Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Midwestone Bank, filed a(n) case against All Unknown Parties, Fifth Third Mortgage Company, Oliveri, Elise, Oliveri, Gaspare, Smith, Carole H, (total of 7) See All in the jurisdiction of Collier County, FL, . Collier County, FL Superior Courts with Foster, Joseph G presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFoster, Joseph G Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 20, 2017 |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 08, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationCollier County, FL |
|
This complaint is a foreclosure action filed by MidwestOne Bank against Carole H. Smith and other defendants in the Circuit Court of the Twentieth Judicial Circuit in Collier County, Florida. MidwestOne Bank, as the successor by merger to Central Ban...
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice Of Redemption | |
July 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Cancelled Foreclosure Sale on 7/11/2019 11:00:00 AM due to | |
June 28, 2019 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Publication of Notice of Sale | |
May 23, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Smith, Carole H, Unknown Spouse Of Carole H Smith, Oliveri, Elise, Oliveri, Gaspare, Fifth Third Mortgage Company, Unknown Spouse Of Donna Lenski, All Unknown Parties | |
April 30, 2019 | Docket Event | Cancelled Hearing on 4/30/2019 8:30:00 AM due to Per Order | |
April 29, 2019 | Docket Event | Confirmation of e-mail Received by Business Observer, regarding Publication | |
April 26, 2019 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Publication of Notice of Sale | |
April 26, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Foreclosure Sale | |
April 26, 2019 | Docket Event | Set on Foreclosure Sale docket 7/11/2019 beginning at 11:00 AM by Clerk (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time) | |
April 26, 2019 | Docket Event | Cancelled Foreclosure Sale on 5/2/2019 11:00:00 AM due to |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.