Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Gass, Jill, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case against 5Th Ave South Investments Llc, Chops City Grill Inc, City Of Naples Florida, in the jurisdiction of Collier County, FL, . Collier County, FL Superior Courts with Unassigned Judge presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeUnassigned Judge Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 19, 2017 |
CategoryNegligence - Premises Liability Commercial |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationCollier County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 20, 2020 | Docket Event | Set on Hearing docket 3/13/2020 beginning at 1:30 PM Hayes, Hugh D (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time) | |
February 19, 2020 | Docket Event | Cancelled Hearing on 2/20/2020 1:30:00 PM due to Per JACS - Moving to another date | |
February 19, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing for Motion For Reconsidersation @ 1:30 | |
June 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
FILE:image/png;23839;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/d6019405-7007-4e50-876c-98e02bdfac17/runs/e9f7e6ff-63f8-403f-ae98-9b8649c17400/executions/dd342412-2c0b-4d4a-a5a8-4d3f5e7a14a8/results/6f268400-b2c7-40fc-b1c0-92a2d0e1aa6d/lines/4c16620b-2762-4983-85e5-684989b0f2f3/Doc Transcript of Deposition |
|
June 18, 2019 | Docket Event | Response to Motion for Summary Judgment | |
June 12, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Interrogatories | |
June 12, 2019 | Docket Event | Request for Production | |
May 24, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Answered Interrogatories | |
May 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Witness List | |
May 14, 2019 | Docket Event | Witness List |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.