Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Tower, Lauren, filed a(n) General Negligence - Torts case against Community Asphalt Corp, in the jurisdiction of Collier County, FL, . Collier County, FL Superior Courts with Hayes, Hugh presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHayes, Hugh Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 11, 2017 |
CategoryNegligence - Other Negligence |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationCollier County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Negligence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 10, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Community Asphalt Corp | |
January 10, 2019 | Docket Event | Cancelled Pre-Trial on 5/1/2019 1:30:00 PM due to CASE DISPOSED | |
September 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Certificate of Non-Objection | |
September 13, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Production from Non-parties | |
September 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation of Taking Deposition | |
August 30, 2018 | Docket Event | Order for Mediation | |
August 29, 2018 | Docket Event | Set on Pre-Trial docket 5/1/2019 beginning at 1:30 PM Hayes, Hugh D (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time) | |
August 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Order Setting Pretrial and Trial Cycle Commencing 070119 | |
August 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Agreed Case Management Plan and Order | |
August 21, 2018 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Production |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.