Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Vanhouten, Lynzi, filed a(n) Slander,Libel,Defamation - Torts case against Nickerson, Melissa, in the jurisdiction of Collier County, FL, . Collier County, FL Superior Courts with Brodie, Lauren L presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBrodie, Lauren L Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2016 |
CategoryLibel Or Slander |
Last RefreshedJuly 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationCollier County, FL |
Matter TypeSlander,Libel,Defamation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 02, 2017 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal Nickerson, Melissa Recorded 2017-08-02 Instrument# 5436555 | |
May 25, 2017 | Docket Event | Order To Effect Service | |
January 06, 2017 | Docket Event | Paid $400.00 on receipt 823281, Fully Paid | |
December 30, 2016 | Docket Event | Libel or Slander | |
December 30, 2016 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
December 30, 2016 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.