Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Power Design Inc, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case against Archer Western Construction, Llc, Archer Western Deangelis Diamond, Jv, Deangelis Diamond Construction, Llc, Travelers Casualty And Surety Company Of America, in the jurisdiction of Collier County, FL, . Collier County, FL Superior Courts with Unassigned Judge presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeUnassigned Judge Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 22, 2016 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedMay 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationCollier County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 23, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Travelers Casualty And Surety Company Of America, | |
March 23, 2017 | Docket Event | Final Disposition Form | |
February 02, 2017 | Docket Event | Return of Service of Summons on Archer Western Deangelis Diamond, Jv,, served 01/27/2017 | |
January 11, 2017 | Docket Event | Return of Service of Summons on Archer Western Deangelis Diamond, Jv,, served 01/03/2017 | |
January 11, 2017 | Docket Event | Return of Service of Summons on Archer Western Construction, Llc,, served 01/03/2017 | |
January 11, 2017 | Docket Event | Return of Service of Summons on Travelers Casualty And Surety Company Of America,, served 01/03/2017 | |
January 11, 2017 | Docket Event | Return of Service of Summons on Deangelis Diamond Construction, Llc,, served 12/29/2016 | |
January 11, 2017 | Docket Event | Return of Service of Summons on Archer Western Deangelis Diamond, Jv,, served 12/29/2016 | |
December 28, 2016 | Docket Event | Paid $460.00 on receipt 821164, Fully Paid | |
December 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
FILE:image/png;292741;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/d6019405-7007-4e50-876c-98e02bdfac17/runs/e9f7e6ff-63f8-403f-ae98-9b8649c17400/executions/bdc6d44e-9da3-4036-9890-b0c9ca8c8af4/results/15e41983-63ac-42db-9d3e-eb01d9e3cde2/lines/00cca478-2bf9-4acf-9fcc-d41f8ad89f51/Doc Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.