Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Mcculley Oman, Elizabeth, filed a(n) Trusts - Probate case against Rugby Llc, Stevens, Michael R, in the jurisdiction of Collier County, FL, . Collier County, FL Superior Courts with Brodie, Lauren L presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBrodie, Lauren L Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 23, 2016 |
CategoryTrust Litigation |
Last RefreshedJuly 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationCollier County, FL |
Matter TypeTrusts |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 08, 2017 | Docket Event | Cancelled Sounding on 7/12/2018 9:30:00 AM due to per JACS - dismissal | |
August 08, 2017 | Docket Event | Cancelled Pre-Trial on 5/17/2018 10:30:00 AM due to per JACS - dismissal | |
August 08, 2017 | Docket Event | Cancelled Jury Trial on 7/16/2018 9:00:00 AM due to disposed | |
August 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
FILE:image/png;33515;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/d6019405-7007-4e50-876c-98e02bdfac17/runs/e9f7e6ff-63f8-403f-ae98-9b8649c17400/executions/bdc6d44e-9da3-4036-9890-b0c9ca8c8af4/results/2cf86124-fecc-45be-a8a4-36d3fe5cd3a7/lines/85040f02-0c22-4ec9-b898-ed95e08dde1e/Doc Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Rugby Llc,, Stevens, Michael R |
|
August 02, 2017 | Docket Event | Order/Referral to Nonbinding Arbitration | |
July 28, 2017 | Docket Event | Set on Sounding docket 7/12/2018 beginning at 9:30 AM Brodie, Lauren L (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time) | |
July 28, 2017 | Docket Event | Set on Pre-Trial docket 5/17/2018 beginning at 10:30 AM Brodie, Lauren L (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time) | |
July 28, 2017 | Docket Event | Set on Jury Trial docket 7/16/2018 beginning at 9:00 AM Brodie, Lauren L (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time) | |
July 28, 2017 | Docket Event | Order Setting Trial, Pretrial Conference and Docket Sounding | |
July 13, 2017 | Docket Event | Cover Letter |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.