Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
J G Wentworth Originations Llc, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case against Egan, J, in the jurisdiction of Collier County, FL, . Collier County, FL Superior Courts with Brodie, Lauren L presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBrodie, Lauren L Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 22, 2016 |
CategoryBusiness Transaction |
Last RefreshedMay 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationCollier County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 20, 2017 | Docket Event | Order Approving Settlement Agreement | |
March 20, 2017 | Docket Event | Proceeding: Hearing | |
March 20, 2017 | Docket Event | Presiding Judge: Brodie, Lauren L | |
March 20, 2017 | Docket Event | Present: J Egan (Defendant) | |
March 20, 2017 | Docket Event | Petition For Court Approval of a Transfer of Structured Settlement Payment Rights- Granted | |
March 20, 2017 | Docket Event | Attorney Present Petitt, Richard Thomas (Plaintiff) | |
March 07, 2017 | Docket Event | Per Judge's Calendar Application For Court Approval Of A Transfer Of Structured Settlement Payment Rights (To Be Heard At 3:00) | |
March 07, 2017 | Docket Event | Set on Hearing docket 3/20/2017 beginning at 1:30 PM Brodie, Lauren L (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time) | |
February 23, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing for Tranfers Application For Court Approval Of A Transfer Of Structured Settlement Payment Rights | |
February 13, 2017 | Docket Event | Proceeding: Hearing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.