Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Vanderboght, Janine, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case against Amera Tech Inc, American Trust Senior Care Llc Dba Discovery Village At Naples, in the jurisdiction of Collier County, FL, . Collier County, FL Superior Courts with Hayes, Hugh D presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHayes, Hugh D Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 23, 2016 |
CategoryNegligence - Premises Liability Commercial |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationCollier County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 03, 2018 | Docket Event | Stipulation for Dismissal | |
May 29, 2018 | Docket Event | Cancelled Pre-Trial on 7/24/2018 1:30:00 PM due to CASE DISPOSED | |
May 25, 2018 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal Amera Tech Inc Recorded 2018-05-29 Instrument# 5562464 | |
April 03, 2018 | Docket Event | Mediator/Mediation Report - Agreement Reached | |
March 30, 2018 | Docket Event | Mediator/Mediation Report - Agreement Reached | |
March 23, 2018 | Docket Event | Certificate of Settlement/Mediation Authority | |
March 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Set on Pre-Trial docket 7/24/2018 beginning at 1:30 PM Hayes, Hugh D (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time) | |
March 02, 2018 | Docket Event | Cancelled Pre-Trial on 7/25/2018 1:30:00 PM due to Per Judge's Calendar | |
March 02, 2018 | Docket Event | Order Setting Pretrial Conference - Amended | |
February 23, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Mediation |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.