Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
American Express Bank Fsb, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case against Pivar, Bruce A, in the jurisdiction of Collier County, FL, . Collier County, FL Superior Courts with Foster, Joseph G presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFoster, Joseph G Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 21, 2016 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedJuly 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationCollier County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 30, 2018 | Docket Event | Per Administrative Order, case reassigned to Judge Hardt, Frederick R | |
February 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Voluntary Dismissal of Garnishment | |
January 18, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Garnishment | |
January 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Answer to Writ of Garnishment from Fifth Third Bank Na | |
January 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Garnishment | |
December 21, 2017 | Docket Event | Paid $85.00 on receipt 900089, Fully Paid | |
December 20, 2017 | Docket Event | Writ of Garnishment | |
December 20, 2017 | Docket Event | Writ of Garnishment Submitted by Attorney | |
December 20, 2017 | Docket Event | Motion for Writ of Garnishment American Express Bank Fsb | |
November 07, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Request For Admission, Interrogatories And Production |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.