Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Redic, James, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case against Southwest Property Management Corporation, Veronawalk Homeowners Association Inc, in the jurisdiction of Collier County, FL, . Collier County, FL Superior Courts with Foster, Joseph G presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFoster, Joseph G Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 21, 2016 |
CategoryNegligence - Premises Liability Commercial |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationCollier County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 08, 2019 | Docket Event | Per Administrative Order, case reassigned to Judge Krier, Elizabeth V | |
May 21, 2018 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal Recorded 2018-05-21 Instrument# 5558999 | |
May 21, 2018 | Docket Event | Cover Letter | |
May 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Cancelled Jury Trial on 6/6/2018 9:00:00 AM due to CASE DISPOSED | |
May 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Stipulation for Dismissal Veronawalk Homeowners Association Inc, Southwest Property Management Corporation | |
April 24, 2018 | Docket Event | Cancelled Pre-Trial on 4/30/2018 9:00:00 AM due to per JACS - case settled | |
April 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Set on Jury Trial docket 6/6/2018 beginning at 9:00 AM Shenko, James R (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time) | |
April 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement | |
April 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Order setting Pretrial Conference and Trial | |
April 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Cancelled Jury Trial on 6/5/2018 9:00:00 AM due to |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.