Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Valenti As Trustee, Peter Angelo, Valentini, Alberta Mackey, Valentini As Trustee, Alberta Mackey, Valentini, Peter Angelo, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case against Tile It Industries Llc, Wci Communities Llc, in the jurisdiction of Collier County, FL, . Collier County, FL Superior Courts with Brodie, Lauren L presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBrodie, Lauren L Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 19, 2016 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedDecember 28, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationCollier County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Motion in Limine -
Date:Notice of Filing
Date:Cover Letter
Date:Request for Production
Date:Motion for Inspection -
Date:Notice of Unavailability
Date:Notice of Arbitration
Date:Complaint, Amended
Date:Magistrate Status Report
Date:Notice of Compliance
Date:Motion to Compel -
Date:Objection to Magistrate
Date:Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Cancelled Hearing on 2/11/2019 9:30:00 AM due to CASE DISPOSED | |
December 06, 2018 | Docket Event | Stipulation for Dismissal Wci Communities Llc, Tile It Industries Llc | |
December 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Set on Hearing docket 2/11/2019 beginning at 9:30 AM Brodie, Lauren L (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time) | |
December 04, 2018 | Docket Event | Order Setting Hearing For Status Conference @ 10:00 | |
November 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Cancelled Jury Trial on 11/26/2018 8:30:00 AM due to Agreement reached | |
November 15, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation of Hearing | |
November 06, 2018 | Docket Event | Mediator/Mediation Report - Agreement Reached | |
November 06, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation of Taking Deposition | |
November 06, 2018 | Docket Event | Cancelled Hearing on 11/19/2018 1:30:00 PM due to per JACS - case settled | |
November 06, 2018 | Docket Event | Cancelled Hearing on 11/13/2018 1:30:00 PM due to per JACS - case settled |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.