Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
American Express Centurion Bank Corporation, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case against Egan, Robert F, in the jurisdiction of Collier County, FL, . Collier County, FL Superior Courts with Foster, Joseph G presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFoster, Joseph G Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 20, 2016 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedMay 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationCollier County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 07, 2019 | Docket Event | Per Administrative Order, case reassigned to Judge Krier, Elizabeth V | |
January 25, 2017 | Docket Event | Return of Non-Service of Summons on Egan, Robert F | |
January 23, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Egan, Robert F | |
December 21, 2016 | Docket Event | Paid $410.00 on receipt 820057, Fully Paid | |
December 20, 2016 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet | |
December 20, 2016 | Docket Event | Contract and Indebtedness | |
December 20, 2016 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
December 20, 2016 | Docket Event | Summons issued electronically | |
December 20, 2016 | Docket Event | Summons Submitted by Attorney on Natural Person CA for Robert F Egan Aka Mr Robert F Egan |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.