Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Krg 951 & 41, Llc, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case against Travelers Casualty And Surety Company Of America, in the jurisdiction of Collier County, FL, . Collier County, FL Superior Courts with Brodie, Lauren L presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBrodie, Lauren L Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 14, 2016 |
CategoryInsurance Claim |
Last RefreshedJuly 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationCollier County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 23, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Travelers Casualty And Surety Company Of America, | |
September 27, 2017 | Docket Event | Attorney Present Weintraub, Lee Alan (Plaintiff) | |
September 27, 2017 | Docket Event | Attorney Present Libanoff, Ira Loren (Defendant) | |
September 27, 2017 | Docket Event | Parties Reached Agreement | |
September 27, 2017 | Docket Event | Proceeding: Hearing | |
September 27, 2017 | Docket Event | Presiding Judge: Brodie, Lauren L | |
September 20, 2017 | Docket Event | Set on Hearing docket 9/27/2017 beginning at 9:30 AM Brodie, Lauren L (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time) | |
September 20, 2017 | Docket Event | Per Judge's Calendar Status Conference | |
March 23, 2017 | Docket Event | Order Granting Stay | |
March 23, 2017 | Docket Event | Cover Letter |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.