Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
In Vehicle Vending System Llc, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case against Lindsay And Allen Pllc, Lindsay, Joseph L, The Lindsay Law Firm Pl, in the jurisdiction of Collier County, FL, . Collier County, FL Superior Courts with Brodie, Lauren L presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBrodie, Lauren L Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 14, 2016 |
CategoryProfessional Malpractice Other Professional |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationCollier County, FL |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 14, 2018 | Docket Event | Stipulation for Dismissal Lindsay, Joseph L, The Lindsay Law Firm Pl, Lindsay And Allen Pllc | |
June 14, 2018 | Docket Event | Cancelled Pre-Trial on 8/23/2018 10:30:00 AM due to CASE DISPOSED | |
June 14, 2018 | Docket Event | Cancelled Jury Trial on 10/15/2018 9:00:00 AM due to CASE DISPOSED | |
June 14, 2018 | Docket Event | Cancelled Sounding on 10/11/2018 9:30:00 AM due to CASE DISPOSED | |
May 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing | |
May 10, 2018 | Docket Event | Cover Letter | |
May 10, 2018 | Docket Event | Order Granting Extension of Time | |
May 08, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing | |
May 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Proceeding: Hearing | |
May 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Status Conference Held |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.