Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Federal National Mortgage Association Fannie Mae, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Dacal, Armond, Dacal, Emily A, Dacal, Mercedes, Unknown Tenant In Possession 2, in the jurisdiction of Collier County, FL, . Collier County, FL Superior Courts with Hayes, Hugh presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHayes, Hugh Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 13, 2016 |
CategoryNon-Homestead Foreclosure $250,000 Or More |
Last RefreshedJuly 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationCollier County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 27, 2020 | Docket Event | Certificate of Sale to Federal National Mortgage Association ("Fannie Mae"), A Corporation Organized And Existing Under The Laws Of The United States Of America | |
February 27, 2020 | Docket Event | Paid $70.00 on receipt 1096524, Fully Paid | |
February 27, 2020 | Docket Event | Bid Sheet $100.00 Plaintiff | |
February 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Publication of Notice of Sale | |
January 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Confirmation of e-mail Received by Business Observer, regarding Publication | |
January 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
FILE:image/png;78705;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/d6019405-7007-4e50-876c-98e02bdfac17/runs/e9f7e6ff-63f8-403f-ae98-9b8649c17400/executions/bdc6d44e-9da3-4036-9890-b0c9ca8c8af4/results/32454686-f3b8-4b66-bd25-7ccd57f244cc/lines/2c438377-ce91-4e07-84f2-c38c4038ed9e/Doc Notice of Foreclosure Sale |
|
January 29, 2020 | Docket Event | Set on Foreclosure Sale docket 2/27/2020 beginning at 11:00 AM by Clerk (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time) | |
January 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations of Residential Foreclosure Magistrate | |
January 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Final Judgment of Foreclosure Recorded 2020-01-29 Instrument# 5821620 | |
January 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Final Disposition Form |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.