Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Freeman, Charles T, filed a(n) Other Circuit Civil case against Natalia Cotea O B O State Of Florida, Florida Department Of Highway Safety And Motor Vehicles, in the jurisdiction of Collier County, FL, . Collier County, FL Superior Courts with Hayes, Hugh D presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHayes, Hugh D Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2014 |
CategoryOther Circuit Civil |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationCollier County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 18, 2016 | Docket Event | Opinion Now Final | |
March 28, 2016 | Docket Event | Order by DCA denying motion For Written Opinion | |
September 18, 2015 | Docket Event | Order by DCA Respondent Shall Respond Within 20 Days | |
September 03, 2015 | Docket Event | Order by DCA Appellant To Supplement Petition Order/Opinion From Circuit Court | |
August 31, 2015 | Docket Event | Acknowledgement of New Case 2D15-3678 | |
August 11, 2015 | Docket Event | Order Denying Rehearing/Reconsideration | |
July 28, 2015 | Docket Event | Order Denying Writ of Certiorari Recorded 2015-07-29 Instrument# 5154007 | |
July 18, 2015 | Docket Event | Certificate of Service | |
April 13, 2015 | Docket Event | Response to Respondent's Answer To His Petition For Writ Of Certiorari | |
April 13, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice Of Supplement To Petitioner's Appendix To Petition For Writ Of Certiorari |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.