Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Mangano, Anne, Mangano, Joseph, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case against Garden Fresh Restaurant Corp Dba Sweet Tomatoes, in the jurisdiction of Collier County, FL, . Collier County, FL Superior Courts with Foster, Joseph G presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFoster, Joseph G Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2014 |
CategoryNegligence - Premises Liability Commercial |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationCollier County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Cover Letter
Date:Notice of Unavailability
Date:Motion to Compel
Date:Request for Production
Date:Request for Admissions
Date:Change Case Status
Date:Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 07, 2019 | Docket Event | Per Administrative Order, case reassigned to Judge Krier, Elizabeth V | |
October 20, 2016 | Docket Event | Cover Letter | |
October 20, 2016 | Docket Event | Suggestion of Bankruptcy Garden Fresh Restaurant Corp Dba Sweet Tomatoes, | |
August 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
FILE:image/png;107363;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/d6019405-7007-4e50-876c-98e02bdfac17/runs/e9f7e6ff-63f8-403f-ae98-9b8649c17400/executions/91f7fbc6-e4d2-4542-915f-a872d3627acf/results/b09ee968-c932-4826-a75b-f6f7f0f2b0e8/lines/69b2a9e3-7a65-420b-96d8-57770ae6597c/Doc Notice of Removal of Case to the District Court |
|
July 21, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Answered Interrogatories | |
July 21, 2015 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Production | |
July 17, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Answered Interrogatories | |
July 17, 2015 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Production | |
July 15, 2015 | Docket Event | Cover Letter | |
July 15, 2015 | Docket Event | Order of Referral to Magistrate |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.