Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Nationstar Mortgage Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Any And All Unknown Parties, Curll, Eileen, Unknown Party 1, Unknown Party 2, Unknown Party 3, (total of 8) See All in the jurisdiction of Collier County, FL, . Collier County, FL Superior Courts with Hayes, Hugh D presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHayes, Hugh D Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2014 |
CategoryHomestead Foreclosure $50,001 - $249,999 |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationCollier County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 18, 2019 | Docket Event | Original Loan Documents Destroyed | |
January 09, 2019 | Docket Event | Evidence Inventory Worksheet | |
December 10, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Intent to Dispose of Exhibits | |
July 10, 2015 | Docket Event | Certificate of Title to Nationstar Mortgage Llc | |
July 10, 2015 | Docket Event | Certificate of Disbursement $0.00 | |
July 06, 2015 | Docket Event | Paid $0.70 on receipt 689193, Fully Paid | |
July 02, 2015 | Docket Event | Cover Letter | |
June 29, 2015 | Docket Event | Paid $70.00 on receipt 687881, Balance Due: $0.70 | |
June 29, 2015 | Docket Event | Bid Sheet $100.00 Plaintiff | |
June 29, 2015 | Docket Event | Certificate of Sale to Nationstar Mortgage Llc |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.