Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Fms Enterprises Migun Ltd, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case against 4755 Enterprise Avenue Llc, Arias, Ricardo, Doe, John, F I B Usa Corp, Mjr Enterprises Of Collier Corp, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Collier County, FL, . Collier County, FL Superior Courts with Krier, Elizabeth V presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKrier, Elizabeth V Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2014 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedJuly 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationCollier County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 07, 2019 | Docket Event | Per Administrative Order, case reassigned to Judge Krier, Elizabeth V | |
April 19, 2017 | Docket Event |
FILE:image/png;101432;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/d6019405-7007-4e50-876c-98e02bdfac17/runs/e9f7e6ff-63f8-403f-ae98-9b8649c17400/executions/91f7fbc6-e4d2-4542-915f-a872d3627acf/results/21bb61db-abab-4161-ab82-6c23c0f31291/lines/d560dca7-6321-4634-a8c6-19031ae9de51/Doc Stipulation for Dismissal F I B Usa Corp,, Mjr Enterprises Of Collier Corp,, 4755 Enterprise Avenue Llc,, Arias, Ricardo, Doe, John |
|
October 26, 2016 | Docket Event | Cancelled Case Management on 11/4/2016 10:00:00 AM due to | |
October 25, 2016 | Docket Event | Cover Letter | |
October 25, 2016 | Docket Event | Agreed Case Management Plan and Order | |
September 12, 2016 | Docket Event | Set on Case Management docket 11/4/2016 beginning at 10:00 AM Shenko, James R (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time) | |
September 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Order Scheduling Case Management Conference | |
August 12, 2016 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Production | |
August 12, 2016 | Docket Event | Objection to Interrogatories | |
June 29, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Interrogatories |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.