Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Us Bank National Association, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Collier County A Political Subdivision Of The State Of Florida, Florida Housing Finance Corporation, Leonard, Ernst, Leonard, Lynda, Unknown Tenant In Possession 1, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Collier County, FL, . Collier County, FL Superior Courts with Brodie, Lauren L presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBrodie, Lauren L Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 24, 2014 |
CategoryNon-Homestead Foreclosure $50,001 - $249,999 |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationCollier County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 12, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of Withdrawal of Motion For Writ Of Possession | |
April 06, 2016 | Docket Event | Paid $50.00 on receipt 758526, Fully Paid | |
April 06, 2016 | Docket Event | Receipt Revised | |
April 05, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance and Designation of Email Address by Knopp, Eric M for Us Bank National Association | |
April 05, 2016 | Docket Event | Motion for Writ of Possession | |
April 05, 2016 | Docket Event | Receipt Number had a refund of $50.00 amount sent to Eric Knopp | |
April 01, 2016 | Docket Event | Per Administrative Order, case reassigned to Judge Brodie, Lauren L | |
March 15, 2016 | Docket Event | Certificate of Disbursement $0.00 | |
March 15, 2016 | Docket Event | Certificate of Title to Federal National Mortgage Association | |
March 03, 2016 | Docket Event | Certificate of Sale to Federal National Mortgage Association |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.