Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Clark, David, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case against Lonberger, Jacqueline, Lugo, Vivian, in the jurisdiction of Collier County, FL, . Collier County, FL Superior Courts with Hayes, Hugh D presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHayes, Hugh D Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 23, 2014 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationCollier County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Cover Letter
Date:Order to Compel
Date:Objection to Magistrate
Date:Motion to Compel
Date:Order for Mediation
Date:Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 14, 2016 | Docket Event | Cover Letter | |
December 14, 2016 | Docket Event | Final Judgment on Recorded 2016-12-14 Instrument# 5345615 | |
December 06, 2016 | Docket Event | Proceeding: Hearing | |
December 06, 2016 | Docket Event | Attorney Present Hamisch, Alan F (Plaintiff) | |
December 06, 2016 | Docket Event | Presiding Judge: Hayes, Hugh D | |
December 06, 2016 | Docket Event | Motion for Final Judgment - Granted | |
November 23, 2016 | Docket Event | Set on Hearing docket 12/6/2016 beginning at 1:30 PM Hayes, Hugh D (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time) | |
November 23, 2016 | Docket Event | Per Judge's Calendar Motion For Final Summary Judgment (To Be Heard At 3:30) | |
November 14, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing for Motion For Summary Final Judgment | |
November 14, 2016 | Docket Event | Motion for Summary Judgment by Clark, David |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.