Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Nationstar Mortgage Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Karen Cook Heir Of The Estate Of John W Mcgee Aka John William Mcgee Deceased, Unknown Heirs Devisees Grantees Assignees Lienors Creditors Trustees Beneficiaries And All Other Claimants Claiming By Through Under Or Against John W Mcgee Deceased Aka John William Mcgee Deceased, Unknown Tenant 1, Unknown Tenant 2, William Mcgee Heir Of The Estate Of John W Mcgee Aka John William Mcgee Deceased, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Collier County, FL, . Collier County, FL Superior Courts with Brodie, Lauren L presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBrodie, Lauren L Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 22, 2014 |
CategoryNon-Homestead Foreclosure $250,000 Or More |
Last RefreshedMay 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationCollier County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 02, 2016 | Docket Event | Proceeding: No Activity Hearing | |
May 02, 2016 | Docket Event | Presiding Judge: Brodie, Lauren L | |
May 02, 2016 | Docket Event | Parties Not Present | |
May 02, 2016 | Docket Event | Dismissed for Lack of Prosecution | |
May 02, 2016 | Docket Event | Order on Notice of No Activity and Dismissed Karen Cook Heir Of The Estate Of John W Mcgee Aka John William Mcgee Deceased,, William Mcgee Heir Of The Estate Of John W Mcgee Aka John William Mcgee Deceased Recorded 2016-05-03 Instrument# 5260255 | |
May 02, 2016 | Docket Event | Final Disposition Form | |
April 01, 2016 | Docket Event | Per Administrative Order, case reassigned to Judge Brodie, Lauren L | |
March 15, 2016 | Docket Event | Returned Mail | |
March 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Returned Mail | |
February 23, 2016 | Docket Event | Set on No Activity Hearing docket 5/2/2016 beginning at 9:00 AM Brodie, Lauren L (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.