Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Hemmer Construction Inc, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case against Boski, Kurt, Sw Florida Home Builders Inc, in the jurisdiction of Collier County, FL, . Collier County, FL Superior Courts with Foster, Joseph G presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFoster, Joseph G Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 23, 2014 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedJuly 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationCollier County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 07, 2019 | Docket Event | Per Administrative Order, case reassigned to Judge Krier, Elizabeth V | |
January 03, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Lead/Responsible Counsel for Hemmer Construction Inc with Yarnell, Floyd Sheldon | |
September 14, 2018 | Docket Event | Set on Hearing docket 10/1/2018 beginning at 9:00 AM Hardt, Frederick R (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time) | |
September 14, 2018 | Docket Event | Cancelled Hearing on 10/1/2018 9:00:00 AM due to per Order | |
September 13, 2018 | Docket Event | Cover Letter | |
September 13, 2018 | Docket Event | Order In Compliance With Automatic Bankruptcy Stay | |
September 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause | |
September 04, 2018 | Docket Event | Motion For Order To Show Cause-Granted | |
September 04, 2018 | Docket Event | Motion For Contempt-Granted | |
September 04, 2018 | Docket Event | Proceeding: Hearing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.