Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Randazzo, Frank, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case against Allan Hendy Designs Inc, Hendy, Allan, in the jurisdiction of Collier County, FL, . Collier County, FL Superior Courts with Hayes, Hugh D presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHayes, Hugh D Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 19, 2014 |
CategoryBusiness Transaction |
Last RefreshedJuly 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationCollier County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 27, 2017 | Docket Event | Stipulation for Dismissal Allan Hendy Designs Inc,, Hendy, Allan | |
July 27, 2017 | Docket Event | Cancelled Pre-Trial on 7/27/2017 1:30:00 PM due to per JACS - per Judge | |
February 09, 2017 | Docket Event | Request for Production | |
February 09, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Interrogatories | |
December 01, 2016 | Docket Event | Statement of Issues of Fact & Law | |
December 01, 2016 | Docket Event | Statement of Facts | |
December 01, 2016 | Docket Event | Witness List | |
October 26, 2016 | Docket Event | Set on Pre-Trial docket 7/27/2017 beginning at 1:30 PM Friedman, David C (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time) | |
October 25, 2016 | Docket Event | Agreed Case Management Plan and Order | |
October 25, 2016 | Docket Event | Order Setting Pre-Trial Conference |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.