Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Raymond James Bank Na, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Mcmeekan, Graeme, Mcmeekan, Kate, Morgan Stanley Private Bank National Association As Successor In Interest To Morgan Stanley Credit Corporation, Unknown Tenant 1 In Possession Of Subject Property, Unknown Tenant 2 In Possession Of Subject Property, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Collier County, FL, . Collier County, FL Superior Courts with Hayes, Hugh D presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHayes, Hugh D Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 18, 2014 |
CategoryHomestead Residential Foreclosure $250,000 Or More |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationCollier County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Original Loan Documents Destroyed | |
May 03, 2017 | Docket Event | Returned Mail | |
May 02, 2017 | Docket Event | Certificate of Disbursement $0.00 | |
May 02, 2017 | Docket Event | Certificate of Title to Raymond James Bank, Na | |
April 28, 2017 | Docket Event | Returned Mail | |
April 27, 2017 | Docket Event | Returned Mail | |
April 24, 2017 | Docket Event | Paid $2,912.00 on receipt 848650, Fully Paid | |
April 21, 2017 | Docket Event | Cover Letter | |
April 21, 2017 | Docket Event | Certificate of Sale to Amended To Raymond James Bank, N.A. | |
April 20, 2017 | Docket Event | Paid $70.00 on receipt 847996, Balance Due: $2,912.00 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.