Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Fifth Third Bank An Ohio Banking Corporation, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case against Svenson, Fred, in the jurisdiction of Collier County, FL, . Collier County, FL Superior Courts with Brodie, Lauren L presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBrodie, Lauren L Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 13, 2014 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedMay 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationCollier County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 01, 2016 | Docket Event | Per Administrative Order, case reassigned to Judge Brodie, Lauren L | |
March 17, 2015 | Docket Event | Settlement Agreement | |
March 17, 2015 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal Svenson, Fred Recorded 2015-03-19 Instrument# 5096622 | |
March 17, 2015 | Docket Event | Cover Letter | |
January 26, 2015 | Docket Event | Return of Service of Summons on Svenson, Fred, served 01/15/2015 | |
December 16, 2014 | Docket Event | Paid $410.00 on receipt 640593, Fully Paid | |
December 15, 2014 | Docket Event | Contract and Indebtedness | |
December 13, 2014 | Docket Event | Summons Submitted by Attorney on Natural Person CA for Fred Svenson | |
December 13, 2014 | Docket Event | Summons issued electronically | |
December 13, 2014 | Docket Event | Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.